PA HB1886 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-31 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for surrender of club licenses for benefit of licensees and for surrender of restaurant, eating place retail dispenser, hotel, importing distributor and distributor license for benefit of licensee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for surrender of club licenses for benefit of licensees and for surrender of restaurant, eating place retail dispenser, hotel, importing distributor and distributor license for benefit of licensee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1886 PN 2597, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-31SenateReferred to LAW AND JUSTICE
2019-10-29SenateIn the Senate
2019-10-29HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2019-10-29HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-10-28HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-28HouseSecond consideration
2019-10-28HouseRemoved from table
2019-10-21HouseLaid on the table
2019-10-21HouseFirst consideration
2019-10-21HouseReported as committed
2019-09-25HouseReferred to LIQUOR CONTROL

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback