PA HB1878 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-7)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for Pennsylvania Workforce Investment Strategy Program, for Cooperative Workforce Investment Partnerships, for employee training programs and for Pennsylvania Workforce Investment Strategy Tax Credit; imposing duties on the Department of Community and Economic Development and the Department of Revenue; providing for carryover, carryback, refund and assignment, for pass-through entity, for administration, for limitation and for interim and annual reports.
Title
Providing for Pennsylvania Workforce Investment Strategy Program, for Cooperative Workforce Investment Partnerships, for employee training programs and for Pennsylvania Workforce Investment Strategy Tax Credit; imposing duties on the Department of Community and Economic Development and the Department of Revenue; providing for carryover, carryback, refund and assignment, for pass-through entity, for administration, for limitation and for interim and annual reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2014-01-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-01-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2014-01-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-12-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-12-17 | House | Second consideration |
2013-12-16 | House | Removed from table |
2013-12-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-12-10 | House | First consideration |
2013-12-10 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-12-09 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |