PA HB1863 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 19 2008 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 29
Status: Enrolled on June 19 2008 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 29
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on PA Route 120 crossing the railroad tracks at the east end of Renovo Borough in Clinton County, Pennsylvania, as the Western Clinton County Veterans Bridge.
Title
An Act designating a bridge on PA Route 120 crossing the railroad tracks at the east end of Renovo Borough in Clinton County, Pennsylvania, as the Western Clinton County Veterans Bridge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-06-27 | Approved by the Governor | |
2008-06-19 | Presented to the Governor | |
2008-06-18 | Signed in Senate | |
2008-06-17 | Signed in House | |
2008-06-16 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-06-11 | Second consideration | |
2008-06-10 | First consideration | |
2008-06-10 | Reported as committed | |
2007-11-27 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION | |
2007-11-19 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-11-14 | Second consideration | |
2007-11-13 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-11-01 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-11-01 | Removed from table | |
2007-10-30 | Laid on the table | |
2007-10-30 | First consideration | |
2007-10-30 | Reported as committed | |
2007-10-02 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1863 |