PA HB1854 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Act No. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a portion of U.S. Route 522 in Snyder County as the Staff Sgt. Stanley R. Saylor Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a portion of U.S. Route 522 in Snyder County as the Staff Sgt. Stanley R. Saylor Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1854 PN 2585, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1854 PN 2585, FP (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03811 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16SenateAct No. 13
2018-04-16SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-04-09SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-04-09SenateSigned in House
2018-03-27SenateSigned in Senate
2018-03-27SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2018-02-05SenateSecond consideration
2018-01-31SenateFirst consideration
2018-01-31SenateReported as committed
2017-11-01SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-10-24SenateIn the Senate
2017-10-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (184-0)
2017-10-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-10-18HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-10-18HouseSecond consideration
2017-10-17HouseRemoved from table
2017-10-16HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-16HouseFirst consideration
2017-10-16HouseReported as amended
2017-10-10HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1854
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1854&pn=2555
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1854&pn=2585
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=10/16/2017&RollCallId=989
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=10/16/2017&RollCallId=988
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=787
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/24/2017&RollCallId=1036
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=01/31/2018&RollCallId=666
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=443

Bill Comments

feedback