PA HB185 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, further providing for the offense of aggravated assault.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In assault, further providing for the offense of aggravated assault.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Floor: HB 185 PN 153, FP (Y: 154 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Floor: HB 185 PN 153, 2021 A365, KINKEAD (Y: 88 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2021-03-16SenateIn the Senate
2021-03-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (154-48)
2021-03-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-15HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-15HouseSecond consideration
2021-02-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-01-27HouseLaid on the table
2021-01-27HouseFirst consideration
2021-01-27HouseReported as committed
2021-01-21HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=185
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0185&pn=0153
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0185P0153.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=01/27/2021&RollCallId=59
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=50
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=59
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/16/2021&RollCallId=172

Bill Comments

feedback