PA HB1846 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on October 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-27 - Act No. 184
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on October 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-27 - Act No. 184
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, further providing for schedule of compensation and for use of savings.
Title
Further providing for schedule of compensation and for use of savings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-01 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-27 | House | Act No. 184 |
2014-10-27 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-23 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-20 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (196-0) |
2014-10-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-15 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-15 | House | In the House |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-07-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2014-04-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-04-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2014-04-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-04-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-04-07 | House | Second consideration |
2014-04-03 | House | Removed from table |
2014-04-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-04-03 | House | First consideration |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-11-18 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |