PA HB1843 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 4 (Amusements) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in administration and enforcement, further providing for compulsive and problem gambling program.
Title
In administration and enforcement, further providing for compulsive and problem gambling program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1843 PN 2840, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1843 PN 2840, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2016-04-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2016-04-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-04-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-04-12 | House | Second consideration |
2016-04-11 | House | Removed from table |
2016-02-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-02-10 | House | First consideration |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |