PA HB1830 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-12)
Status: Passed on October 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-24 - Act No. 158
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-12)
Status: Passed on October 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-24 - Act No. 158
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for special plates for individuals in the service of the United States Merchant Marine and for a special registration plate for veterans and members of United States military airborne units.
Title
Providing for special plates for individuals in the service of the United States Merchant Marine and for a special registration plate for veterans and members of United States military airborne units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-17 - House - HB 1830 PN 4214, CONCUR (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - Senate - HB 1830 PN 4214, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-30 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - HB 1830 PN 2607, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - Senate - HB 1830 PN 4214, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-30 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - HB 1830 PN 2607, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-24 | House | Act No. 158 |
2012-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2012-10-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2012-10-18 | House | Signed in Senate |
2012-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2012-10-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (191-0) |
2012-10-17 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-10-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2012-10-16 | House | In the House |
2012-10-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2012-10-03 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-10-03 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-10-02 | Senate | Removed from table |
2012-06-30 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2012-06-30 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2012-05-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-03-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2012-02-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-02-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2012-02-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-01-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-01-25 | House | Second consideration |
2012-01-24 | House | Removed from table |
2011-12-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-12-07 | House | First consideration |
2011-12-07 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-10-24 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |