PA HB1825 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-31 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-31 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rules of the road in general, further providing for speed timing devices.
Title
In rules of the road in general, further providing for speed timing devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1825 PN 2487, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1825 PN 2487, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-31 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-10-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-10-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2019-10-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-29 | House | Second consideration |
2019-10-23 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-21 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-09-17 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |