PA HB1825 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Act No. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Act No. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey by quitclaim deeds to Aber and Hockenberry, Mary E. Crotzer, Ronald and Michael Haines, Randy D. Payton Sr., Jack L. Hanna and Victor and Katherine Crum, certain lands situate in Curtin Township, Centre County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to the Centre County Industrial Development Corporation certain lands situate in Benner Township, Centre County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to Randy M. Thomas, or his assigns, a permanent utility easement across certain lands situate in White Township, Indiana County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to remove and release the restrictive use covenants imposed on certain real property situate in the Borough of Blossburg, Tioga County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a competitive bid process, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in the Borough of Canonsburg, Washington County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to VARHA, Inc., certain lands situate in the Borough of Polk, Venango County; authorizing the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to Ohiopyle Borough certain lands situate in Ohiopyle Borough, Fayette County, in exchange for Ohiopyle Borough granting and conveying certain lands to the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to be added to those existing lands at Ohiopyle State Park; authorizing the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to Kyle A. and Tamara J. Boltz certain lands situate in Union Township, Lebanon County, in exchange for Kyle A. and Tamara J. Boltz's granting and conveying certain lands to the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, to be added to those existing lands at Swatara State Park; and making related repeals.
Title
Authorizing the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey by quitclaim deeds to Aber and Hockenberry, Mary E. Crotzer, Ronald and Michael Haines, Randy D. Payton Sr., Jack L. Hanna and Victor and Katherine Crum, certain lands situate in Curtin Township, Centre County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to the Centre County Industrial Development Corporation certain lands situate in Benner Township, Centre County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to Randy M. Thomas, or his assigns, a permanent utility easement across certain lands situate in White Township, Indiana County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to remove and release the restrictive use covenants imposed on certain real property situate in the Borough of Blossburg, Tioga County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey, at a price to be determined through a competitive bid process, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in the Borough of Canonsburg, Washington County; authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to VARHA, Inc., certain lands situate in the Borough of Polk, Venango County; authorizing the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to Ohiopyle Borough certain lands situate in Ohiopyle Borough, Fayette County, in exchange for Ohiopyle Borough granting and conveying certain lands to the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to be added to those existing lands at Ohiopyle State Park; authorizing the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to Kyle A. and Tamara J. Boltz certain lands situate in Union Township, Lebanon County, in exchange for Kyle A. and Tamara J. Boltz's granting and conveying certain lands to the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, to be added to those existing lands at Swatara State Park; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - House - HB 1825 PN 3494, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - HB 1825 PN 3494, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - House - HB 1825 PN 2339, FP (Y: 110 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - House - HB 1825 PN 2339, MOT RECOM, JOSEPHS (Y: 88 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-10-17 - House - HB 1825 PN 2339, 2011 A5334, JOSEPHS (Y: 87 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2011-10-17 - House - HB 1825 PN 2339, 2011 A5333, JOSEPHS (Y: 87 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2011-10-17 - House - HB 1825 PN 2339, MOT RECOM, BARBIN (Y: 87 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-05-22 - Senate - HB 1825 PN 3494, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - House - HB 1825 PN 2339, FP (Y: 110 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - House - HB 1825 PN 2339, MOT RECOM, JOSEPHS (Y: 88 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-10-17 - House - HB 1825 PN 2339, 2011 A5334, JOSEPHS (Y: 87 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2011-10-17 - House - HB 1825 PN 2339, 2011 A5333, JOSEPHS (Y: 87 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2011-10-17 - House - HB 1825 PN 2339, MOT RECOM, BARBIN (Y: 87 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | House | Act No. 55 |
2012-05-29 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2012-05-24 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2012-05-24 | House | Signed in Senate |
2012-05-23 | House | Signed in House |
2012-05-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (195-2) |
2012-05-23 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-05-23 | House | Referred to RULES |
2012-05-22 | House | In the House |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2012-05-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-05-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2011-10-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-10-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (110-88) |
2011-10-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-10-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-10-17 | House | Second consideration |
2011-10-05 | House | Removed from table |
2011-10-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-10-04 | House | First consideration |
2011-10-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-08-31 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |