PA HB1822 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-29 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-29 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in dispositions independent of letters, family exemption, probate of wills and grant of letters, further providing for payments to family and funeral directors.
Title
In dispositions independent of letters, family exemption, probate of wills and grant of letters, further providing for payments to family and funeral directors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1822 PN 2066, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1822 PN 2066, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-29 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2021-12-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-12-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2021-12-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-12-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-12-14 | House | Second consideration |
2021-12-13 | House | Removed from table |
2021-11-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-09 | House | First consideration |
2021-11-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-08-31 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |