PA HB1805 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-05 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-05 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 27, 2014 (P.L.2911, No.191), known as the Achieving Better Care by Monitoring All Prescriptions Program (ABC-MAP) Act, providing for licensing boards to require education in pain management, addiction and prescribing and dispensing practices for opioids.
Title
Providing for licensing boards to require education in pain management, addiction and prescribing and dispensing practices for opioids.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1805 PN 3534, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A08352 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A08352 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2016-06-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2016-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2016-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-15 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to HEALTH |