PA HB1781 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-01 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-01 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, in liability and compensation, providing for registration of status as independent contractor.
Title
In liability and compensation, providing for registration of status as independent contractor.
Sponsors
Rep. Frederick Keller [R] | Rep. Jim Cox [R] | Rep. Seth Grove [R] | Rep. John McGinnis [R] |
Rep. Duane Milne [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-24 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A09220 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-10-01 | House | First consideration |
2018-10-01 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-09-12 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |