PA HB1774 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Act No. 72 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Act No. 72 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 27, 2014 (P.L.2911, No.191), known as the Achieving Better Care by Monitoring All Prescriptions Program (ABC-MAP) Act, further providing for access to prescription information and for expiration; and making an editorial change.
Title
Further providing for access to prescription information and for expiration; and making an editorial change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1774 PN 2149, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-27 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1774 PN 2149, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1774 PN 2011, 2021 A2267 (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-20 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-27 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1774 PN 2149, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1774 PN 2011, 2021 A2267 (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-20 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Senate | Act No. 72 of 2021 |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Signed in House |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-09-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-09-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2021-09-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-09-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2021-09-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-21 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-09-20 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-20 | House | First consideration |
2021-09-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-08-11 | House | Referred to HEALTH |