PA HB177 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 177 PN 341, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A00137 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2017-03-20SenateIn the Senate
2017-03-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2017-03-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-03-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-03-13HouseSecond consideration
2017-02-08HouseRemoved from table
2017-02-06HouseLaid on the table
2017-02-06HouseFirst consideration
2017-02-06HouseReported as amended
2017-01-23HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=177
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0177&pn=0140
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0177&pn=0341
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=02/06/2017&RollCallId=25
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=02/06/2017&RollCallId=26
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=85
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/20/2017&RollCallId=95

Bill Comments

feedback