PA HB176 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on October 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-25 - Act No. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions and for application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions and for application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-16 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Floor: HB 176 PN 2222, CONCUR (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 176 PN 2222, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 176 PN 1818, A2883, BROOKS AMENDMENT NO. A-2883 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 176 PN 1818, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A00587 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-25HouseAct No. 35
2017-10-25HouseApproved by the Governor
2017-10-17HousePresented to the Governor
2017-10-17HouseSigned in Senate
2017-10-16HouseSigned in House
2017-10-16HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (191-0)
2017-10-16HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2017-07-10HouseReferred to RULES
2017-07-10HouseIn the House
2017-07-10SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2017-07-09SenateSecond consideration, with amendments (49-0)
2017-07-08SenateFirst consideration
2017-07-08SenateReported as committed
2017-06-09SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2017-06-06SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2017-06-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-05HouseSecond consideration
2017-05-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-23HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-23HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-23HouseReported as amended
2017-01-23HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=176
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0176&pn=0139
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0176&pn=1818
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0176&pn=2222
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=05/23/2017&RollCallId=445
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=05/23/2017&RollCallId=446
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=413
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/06/2017&RollCallId=516
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=13&theDate=07/08/2017&RollCallId=414
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=229
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=247
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=751
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=10/16/2017&RollCallId=993

Bill Comments

feedback