PA HB1745 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for a tuition and fee waiver program for youth who are or have been in substitute care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for a tuition and fee waiver program for youth who are or have been in substitute care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1745 PN 3744, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A07695 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2018-06-22SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-22HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-0)
2018-06-22HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-21HouseSecond consideration
2018-06-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-19HouseRe-committed to RULES
2018-06-19HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-19HouseReported as amended
2017-08-24HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1745
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1745&pn=2342
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1745&pn=3744
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=06/19/2018&RollCallId=1693
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=06/19/2018&RollCallId=1694
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1800
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1833
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1403

Bill Comments

feedback