PA HB1743 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on October 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-13 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-13 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school directors, further providing for school director training programs.
Title
In school directors, further providing for school director training programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-12 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-13 | House | Removed from table |
2023-12-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-12-12 | House | First consideration |
2023-12-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-10-04 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |