PA HB1738 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Amended on third consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in commencement of proceedings, further providing for definitions, providing for nonmunicipal police extraterritorial jurisdiction for purposes of municipal police jurisdiction and for agents of the Office of Attorney General for purposes of municipal police jurisdiction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In commencement of proceedings, further providing for definitions, providing for nonmunicipal police extraterritorial jurisdiction for purposes of municipal police jurisdiction and for agents of the Office of Attorney General for purposes of municipal police jurisdiction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1738 PN 2335, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-06-13SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-06SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-06SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-05SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-05SenateReported as amended
2017-12-08SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-12-06SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (187-0)
2017-12-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-05HouseSecond consideration
2017-12-04HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-21HouseFirst consideration
2017-11-21HouseReported as committed
2017-08-24HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1738
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1738&pn=2335
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1738&pn=3609
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1738&pn=3732
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=11/21/2017&RollCallId=1077
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=884
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/06/2017&RollCallId=1126
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/05/2018&RollCallId=893
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/13/2018&RollCallId=965

Bill Comments

feedback