PA HB1730 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 19, 1980 (P.L.15, No.9), known as the Real Estate Licensing and Registration Act, in application of the act and penalties, further providing for exclusions.
Title
In application of the act and penalties, further providing for exclusions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1730 PN 2066, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1730 PN 2066, 2023 A2995 (Y: 24 N: 176 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-11-15 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1730 PN 2066, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1730 PN 2066, 2023 A2995 (Y: 24 N: 176 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-11-15 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2024-06-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-04-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2024-04-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-04-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-04-10 | House | Second consideration |
2024-04-09 | House | Removed from table |
2023-11-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-11-15 | House | First consideration |
2023-11-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-10-02 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |