PA HB1717 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-33)
Status: Introduced on July 6 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-07-06 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on July 6 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-07-06 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
A Supplement to the act of July 2, 2006 (P.L. No.2A) entitled "An act to provide from the General Fund for the expenses of the Executive, Legislative and Judicial Departments of the Commonwealth, the public debt and for the public schools for the fiscal year July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2007, for certain institutions and organizations, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2006; to provide appropriations from the State Lottery Fund, the Energy Conservation and Assistance Fund, the Hazardous Material Response Fund, The State Stores Fund, the Milk Marketing Fund, the Home Investment Trust Fund, the Emergency Medical Services Operating Fund, the Tuition Payment Fund, the Banking Department Fund, the Firearm Records Check Fund, the Ben Franklin Technology Development Authority Fund, the Tobacco Settlement Fund and the Health Care Provider Retention Account to the Executive Department; to provide appropriations from the Judicial Computer System Augmentation Account to the Judicial Department for the fiscal year July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2007; to provide appropriations from the Motor License Fund for the fiscal year July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2007, for the proper operation of the several departments of the Commonwealth and the Pennsylvania State Police authorized to spend Motor License Fund moneys; to provide for the appropriation of Federal funds to the Executive Department of the Commonwealth and for the establishment of restricted receipt accounts for the fiscal year July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2007, and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2006; to provide for the additional appropriation of Federal and State funds from the General Fund, the Motor License Fund and the State Lottery Fund for the Executive, Legislative and Judicial Departments of the Commonwealth for the fiscal year July 1, 2005, to June 30, 2006, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2005," providing for an appropriation for the period from July 1 to July 31, 2007.
Title
A Supplement to the act of July 2, 2006 (P.L. No.2A) entitled "An act to provide from the General Fund for the expenses of the Executive, Legislative and Judicial Departments of the Commonwealth, the public debt and for the public schools for the fiscal year July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2007, for certain institutions and organizations, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2006; to provide appropriations from the State Lottery Fund, the Energy Conservation and Assistance Fund, the Hazardous Material Response Fund, The State Stores Fund, the Milk Marketing Fund, the Home Investment Trust Fund, the Emergency Medical Services Operating Fund, the Tuition Payment Fund, the Banking Department Fund, the Firearm Records Check Fund, the Ben Franklin Technology Development Authority Fund, the Tobacco Settlement Fund and the Health Care Provider Retention Account to the Executive Department; to provide appropriations from the Judicial Computer System Augmentation Account to the Judicial Department for the fiscal year July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2007; to provide appropriations from the Motor License Fund for the fiscal year July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2007, for the proper operation of the several departments of the Commonwealth and the Pennsylvania State Police authorized to spend Motor License Fund moneys; to provide for the appropriation of Federal funds to the Executive Department of the Commonwealth and for the establishment of restricted receipt accounts for the fiscal year July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2007, and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2006; to provide for the additional appropriation of Federal and State funds from the General Fund, the Motor License Fund and the State Lottery Fund for the Executive, Legislative and Judicial Departments of the Commonwealth for the fiscal year July 1, 2005, to June 30, 2006, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2005," providing for an appropriation for the period from July 1 to July 31, 2007.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-07-06 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1717 |