PA HB1702 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 166
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 166
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of Aging to license and inspect community adult respite services programs; defining "community adult respite service providers"; and imposing additional powers and duties on the Department of Aging.
Title
Authorizing the Department of Aging to license and inspect community adult respite services programs; defining "community adult respite service providers"; and imposing additional powers and duties on the Department of Aging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-22 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Act No. 166 |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-14 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-14 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-08 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (192-0) |
2014-10-08 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-08 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-07 | House | In the House |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-09-22 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2014-03-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-03-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2014-03-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-03-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-03-18 | House | Second consideration |
2014-03-17 | House | Removed from table |
2014-03-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-03-12 | House | First consideration |
2014-03-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-09-25 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |