PA HB1698 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Amended on third consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Amended on third consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for coverage requirements by an insurance carrier or health insurance plan for abuse-deterrent opioid analgesic drug products.
Title
Providing for coverage requirements by an insurance carrier or health insurance plan for abuse-deterrent opioid analgesic drug products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1698 PN 3532, FP (Y: 190 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A08357 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A08398 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1698 PN 3532, FP (Y: 190 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A08357 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A08398 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-25 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-10-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-07-05 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2016-06-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-3) |
2016-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2016-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-15 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to HEALTH |