PA HB1694 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-14 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 2, 1966 (1965 P.L.1860, No.586), entitled "An act encouraging landowners to make land and water areas available to the public for recreational purposes by limiting liability in connection therewith, and repealing certain acts," further providing for definitions, for duty to keep premises safe and warning and for assurance of safe premises and duty of care and responsibility and liability.
Title
Amending the act of February 2, 1966 (1965 P.L.1860, No.586), entitled "An act encouraging landowners to make land and water areas available to the public for recreational purposes by limiting liability in connection therewith, and repealing certain acts," further providing for definitions, for duty to keep premises safe and warning and for assurance of safe premises and duty of care and responsibility and liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1694 PN 2324, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A02738 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1694 PN 2324, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A02738 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-07 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-12-29 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2021-12-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-12-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2021-12-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-12-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-12-14 | House | Second consideration |
2021-12-13 | House | Removed from table |
2021-10-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-27 | House | First consideration |
2021-10-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |