PA HB1672 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 165
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 165
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the testing of new, environmentally beneficial and energy efficient technologies within various State agencies.
Title
Providing for the testing of new, environmentally beneficial and energy efficient technologies within various State agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Miller [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Katharine Watson [R] | Rep. Thomas Caltagirone [D] |
Rep. Mauree Gingrich [R] | Rep. Mark Cohen [D] | Rep. Garth Everett [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-09-22 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-21 - House - HB 1672 PN 2428, FP (Y: 189 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-21 - House - HB 1672 PN 2428, FP (Y: 189 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Act No. 165 |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-14 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-14 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-08 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (176-16) |
2014-10-08 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-08 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-07 | House | In the House |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-09-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-09-15 | Senate | Removed from table |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-05-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-10-30 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2013-10-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-10-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-8) |
2013-10-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-10-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-10-16 | House | Second consideration |
2013-10-15 | House | Removed from table |
2013-10-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-10-02 | House | First consideration |
2013-10-02 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-09-03 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |