PA HB1664 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 40 (Insurance) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in regulation of insurers and related persons generally, providing for payment choice.
Title
In regulation of insurers and related persons generally, providing for payment choice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1664 PN 2787, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A03487 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1664 PN 2787, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A03487 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2024-04-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-04-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2024-04-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-03-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-03-27 | House | Second consideration |
2024-03-26 | House | Removed from table |
2024-03-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-03-25 | House | First consideration |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-09-12 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |