PA HB1658 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-28 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-28 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 74 (Transportation) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in public utility facilities, further providing for adjustment.
Title
In public utility facilities, further providing for adjustment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1658 PN 1857, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-09-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-09-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2021-09-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-27 | House | Second consideration |
2021-09-22 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-17 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |