PA HB1657 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Introduced on September 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-11 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-11 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 2008 (P.L.182, No.27), known as the Clean Indoor Air Act, further providing for title of act, for definitions, for prohibition, for signage, for enforcement, for preemption of local ordinances and for repeal; and making editorial changes.
Title
Further providing for title of act, for definitions, for prohibition, for signage, for enforcement, for preemption of local ordinances and for repeal; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-15 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A02991 (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A02750 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A02920 (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A02750 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A02920 (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | House | Laid on the table (Pursuant to House Rule 71) |
2024-04-16 | House | Removed from table |
2023-11-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-11-15 | House | First consideration |
2023-11-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-09-06 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1961 |
2023-09-05 | House | Referred to HEALTH |