PA HB1656 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-02 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-02 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 15, 1933 (P.L.565, No.111), known as the Department of Banking Code, further providing for administration.
Title
Further providing for administration.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Daley [D] | Rep. Chris Ross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-02 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-07-02 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-16 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-16 | First consideration | |
2009-06-16 | Reported as amended | |
2009-06-10 | Referred to COMMERCE |