PA HB1612 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-11 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-11 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 27, 1953 (P.L.244, No.34), entitled "An act relating to and regulating the contracts of incorporated towns and providing penalties," further providing for regulation of contracts.
Title
Amending the act of May 27, 1953 (P.L.244, No.34), entitled "An act relating to and regulating the contracts of incorporated towns and providing penalties," further providing for regulation of contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Harper [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. Warren Kampf [R] | Rep. Robert James [R] |
Rep. Mary Jo Daley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-10-04 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-12-11 | House | Removed from table |
2017-10-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-10-04 | House | First consideration |
2017-10-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-06-23 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |