PA HB1595 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-5)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, providing for medical assistance reimbursement for pharmacies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In public assistance, providing for medical assistance reimbursement for pharmacies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-24HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-28HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-28HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-28HouseReported as committed
2017-06-21HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback