PA HB1546 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-17 - Act No. 165 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-17 - Act No. 165 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in assault, providing for the offense of endangerment of public safety official.
Title
In assault, providing for the offense of endangerment of public safety official.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-15 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1546 PN 3569, CONCURRENCE (Y: 158 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1546 PN 3569, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Adopt Amendment A05703 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended A05703 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1546 PN 1785, FP (Y: 179 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1546 PN 1785, MOT RECOM JUDICIARY, BRIGGS (Y: 88 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-06-14 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1546 PN 3569, CONCURRENCE (Y: 158 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1546 PN 3569, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Adopt Amendment A05703 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended A05703 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1546 PN 1785, FP (Y: 179 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1546 PN 1785, MOT RECOM JUDICIARY, BRIGGS (Y: 88 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-06-14 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-17 | House | Act No. 165 of 2022 |
2022-11-17 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-11-16 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-11-15 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-11-15 | House | Signed in House |
2022-11-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (158-39) |
2022-11-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-10-26 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-10-25 | House | In the House |
2022-10-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-2) |
2022-10-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-10-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-10-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2021-11-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-11-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (179-20) |
2021-11-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-11-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-11-15 | House | Second consideration |
2021-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-11 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |