PA HB1516 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-11)
Status: Engrossed on October 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-05 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-05 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge to be constructed on that portion of State Route 119 over the Pine Run Creek, Rayne Township, Indiana County, as the PFC Frank Enzer Weiss United States Marine Corps Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge to be constructed on that portion of State Route 119 over the Pine Run Creek, Rayne Township, Indiana County, as the PFC Frank Enzer Weiss United States Marine Corps Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1516 PN 1941, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1516 PN 1941, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-10-02 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-10-02 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-0) |
2017-10-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-09-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-09-27 | House | Second consideration |
2017-09-26 | House | Removed from table |
2017-09-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-09-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-28 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-28 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-28 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-06-07 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |