PA HB1512 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board, further providing for general powers of board.
Title
In Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board, further providing for general powers of board.
Sponsors
Rep. Jesse Topper [R] | Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R] | Rep. George Dunbar [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] |
Rep. Michael Reese [R] | Sen. Greg Rothman [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Pyle [R] | Rep. Craig Staats [R] |
Rep. Marci Mustello [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-19 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-10 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-09-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-05-29 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |