PA HB150 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Act No. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Act No. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, providing for Share the Road plate.
Title
In registration of vehicles, providing for Share the Road plate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 150 PN 2573, CONCUR (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 150 PN 2573, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Floor: HB 150 PN 130, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 150 PN 2573, CONCUR (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 150 PN 2573, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Floor: HB 150 PN 130, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | House | Act No. 36 |
2016-06-08 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-06-01 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-05-30 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-05-24 | House | Signed in House |
2016-05-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (189-0) |
2016-05-24 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-05-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-05-16 | House | In the House |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2015-12-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-11-24 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-04-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2015-02-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-02-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2015-02-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-02-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-02-10 | House | Second consideration |
2015-02-09 | House | Removed from table |
2015-02-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-02-03 | House | First consideration |
2015-02-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |