PA HB1499 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on October 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-19 - Act No. 84
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 68 (Real and Personal Property) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in creation, alteration and termination of condominiums, further providing for contents of declaration and all condominiums; in management of the condominium, further providing for powers of unit owners' association, for executive board members and officers and for conveyance or encumbrance of common elements; in protection of purchasers, further providing for release of liens and for warranty against structural defects; in creation, alteration and termination of cooperatives, further providing for contents of declaration; in management of cooperatives, further providing for powers of association, for executive board members and officers and for conveyance or encumbrance of cooperative; in protection of cooperative interest purchasers, further providing for release of liens and for implied warranty against structural defects; in general provisions relating to planned communities, further providing for definitions; in creation, alteration and termination of planned communities, further providing for construction and validity of declaration and bylaws and for contents of declaration and all planned communities; in management of planned community, further providing for power of unit owners' association, for executive board members and officers and for conveyance or encumbrance of common facilities; and, in protection of purchasers, further providing for release of liens and for warranty against structural defects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In creation, alteration and termination of condominiums, further providing for contents of declaration and all condominiums; in management of the condominium, further providing for powers of unit owners' association, for executive board members and officers and for conveyance or encumbrance of common elements; in protection of purchasers, further providing for release of liens and for warranty against structural defects; in creation, alteration and termination of cooperatives, further providing for contents of declaration; in management of cooperatives, further providing for powers of association, for executive board members and officers and for conveyance or encumbrance of cooperative; in protection of cooperative interest purchasers, further providing for release of liens and for implied warranty against structural defects; in general provisions relating to planned communities, further providing for definitions; in creation, alteration and termination of planned communities, further providing for construction and validity of declaration and bylaws and for contents of declaration and all planned communities; in management of planned community, further providing for power of unit owners' association, for executive board members and officers and for conveyance or encumbrance of common facilities; and, in protection of purchasers, further providing for release of liens and for warranty against structural defects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1499 PN 3688, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1499 PN 3688, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1499 PN 1919, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-09-26 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-19HouseAct No. 84
2018-10-19HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-10-12HousePresented to the Governor
2018-10-12HouseSigned in Senate
2018-10-10HouseSigned in House
2018-10-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (194-0)
2018-10-09HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-10-09HouseReferred to RULES
2018-10-02HouseIn the House
2018-10-02SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2018-09-24SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-18SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-18SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-13SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-13SenateReported as amended
2017-11-01SenateReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
2017-10-16SenateIn the Senate
2017-10-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2017-10-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-10-03HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-10-03HouseSecond consideration
2017-10-02HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-26HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-26HouseFirst consideration
2017-09-26HouseReported as committed
2017-06-06HouseReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1499
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1499&pn=1919
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1499&pn=3688
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=09/26/2017&RollCallId=919
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=746
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/16/2017&RollCallId=1000
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=35&theDate=06/13/2018&RollCallId=952
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1071
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=672
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=10/09/2018&RollCallId=2042
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1531

Bill Comments

feedback