PA HB1479 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-10-19 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-10-19 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in boards and offices, providing for Office of Information Technology.
Title
In boards and offices, providing for Office of Information Technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1479 PN 1665, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 161 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1479 PN 1665, 2023 A1644 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-28 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1479 PN 1665, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 161 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1479 PN 1665, 2023 A1644 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-28 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-19 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2023-10-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-10-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (161-42) |
2023-10-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-10-02 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-10-02 | House | Second consideration |
2023-10-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-09-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2023-09-22 | House | Removed from table |
2023-09-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-09-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-28 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2023-06-28 | House | First consideration |
2023-06-28 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-06-21 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |