PA HB1459 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-5)
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Act No. 69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions relating to emergency management services, further providing for definitions; providing for emergency responder mental wellness and stress management; establishing the Statewide Critical Incident Stress Management Program; providing for duties of the Secretary of Health and the Department of Health; in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for immunity from civil liability; and, in emergency medical services system, further providing for support of emergency medical services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions relating to emergency management services, further providing for definitions; providing for emergency responder mental wellness and stress management; establishing the Statewide Critical Incident Stress Management Program; providing for duties of the Secretary of Health and the Department of Health; in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for immunity from civil liability; and, in emergency medical services system, further providing for support of emergency medical services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1459 PN 4149, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1459 PN 4149, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1459 PN 2816, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1459 PN 2569, 2019 A3563, SCHLOSSBERG (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1459 PN 2569, 2019 A3563, SUSP RULES, SCHLOSSBERG (Y: 194 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A02872 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A02667 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-23HouseAct No. 69
2020-07-23HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-07-15HousePresented to the Governor
2020-07-15HouseSigned in Senate
2020-07-14HouseSigned in House
2020-07-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
2020-07-14HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-07-14HouseReferred to RULES
2020-07-14HouseIn the House
2020-07-14SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2020-07-14SenateAmended on third consideration
2020-06-29SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-06-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-24SenateSecond consideration
2020-06-22SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-22SenateReported as amended
2019-10-31SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2019-10-30SenateIn the Senate
2019-10-30HouseThird consideration and final passage (198-0)
2019-10-30HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-10-29HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-29HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-10-22HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-24HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-24HouseFirst consideration
2019-09-24HouseReported as amended
2019-05-14HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1459
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1459&pn=1826
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1459&pn=2569
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1459&pn=2816
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1459&pn=3945
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1459&pn=4149
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=09/24/2019&RollCallId=1105
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=09/24/2019&RollCallId=1106
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=09/24/2019&RollCallId=1107
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=776
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=777
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=812
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/30/2019&RollCallId=1321
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=06/22/2020&RollCallId=965
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/29/2020&RollCallId=1038
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=602
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1536
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=07/14/2020&RollCallId=2367

Bill Comments

feedback