PA HB1452 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-05 - Act No. 82 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-05 - Act No. 82 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 44 (Law and Justice) and 45 (Legal Notices) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for flexibility in emergency publication of the Pennsylvania Bulletin: in Uniform Electronic Legal Material Act, further providing for definitions; and, in codification and publication of documents, further providing for preliminary publication in Pennsylvania Bulletin.
Title
Providing for flexibility in emergency publication of the Pennsylvania Bulletin: in Uniform Electronic Legal Material Act, further providing for definitions; and, in codification and publication of documents, further providing for preliminary publication in Pennsylvania Bulletin.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1452 PN 1573, Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1452 PN 1573, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1452 PN 1573, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-05 | Senate | Act No. 82 of 2021 |
2021-11-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (43-6) |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-09-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2021-06-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-15 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |