PA HB1451 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-21 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: Senate Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-21 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: Senate Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in special licenses and permits, further providing for definitions, for exotic wildlife possession permits, for menagerie permits and for exclusions.
Title
In special licenses and permits, further providing for definitions, for exotic wildlife possession permits, for menagerie permits and for exclusions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1451 PN 1635, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 109 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-30 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-30 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-21 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2023-11-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-11-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (109-94) |
2023-10-31 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-10-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-10-30 | House | Second consideration |
2023-10-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-09-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2023-09-22 | House | Removed from table |
2023-09-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-09-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-28 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2023-06-28 | House | First consideration |
2023-06-28 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-06-20 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |