PA HB1448 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-11 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for higher education accountability and transparency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for higher education accountability and transparency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1448 PN 2109, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1448 PN 2060, 2017 A2157, SIMS (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A02025 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-11SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-10-25SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-10-25SenateSecond consideration
2017-10-24SenateFirst consideration
2017-10-24SenateReported as committed
2017-07-06SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2017-06-26SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-26HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2017-06-26HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-21HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-21HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-06-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-19HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-19HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-19HouseReported as amended
2017-05-25HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1448
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1448&pn=1848
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1448&pn=2060
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1448&pn=2109
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=06/19/2017&RollCallId=648
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=06/19/2017&RollCallId=649
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=534
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/21/2017&RollCallId=716
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=541
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/26/2017&RollCallId=737
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=10/24/2017&RollCallId=513
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=575

Bill Comments

feedback