PA HB1448 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Act No. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Act No. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 24, 1956 (1955, P.L.1674, No.566), entitled "An act authorizing council of any incorporated town to create the office of town manager, and prescribe his powers and duties," further providing for the office of town manager and for powers and duties of a town manager.
Title
Amending the act of May 24, 1956 (1955, P.L.1674, No.566), entitled "An act authorizing council of any incorporated town to create the office of town manager, and prescribe his powers and duties," further providing for the office of town manager and for powers and duties of a town manager.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Creighton [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. Mauree Gingrich [R] | Rep. William Kortz [D] |
Rep. Chris Ross [R] | Sen. Steven Santarsiero [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-30 - Senate - HB 1448 PN 1738, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - House - HB 1448 PN 1738, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - House - HB 1448 PN 1738, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-07 | Senate | Act No. 53 |
2011-07-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-06-14 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-06-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-06-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2011-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-06-08 | House | Second consideration |
2011-06-06 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2011-05-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-05-03 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |