PA HB1438 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in emergency COVID-19 response, providing for COVID-19 Community Fitness-Related Business Grant Program.
Title
In emergency COVID-19 response, providing for COVID-19 Community Fitness-Related Business Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A01444 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A01444 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-09 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-09 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-05-17 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |