PA HB1438 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-11 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-11 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 16 (Counties) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, adding provisions for required fiscal security through bonding, blanket bonding and insuring of elected and appointed county officers and employees; providing for determining the form, amount and payment of premiums for and the filing and recording of the required security and for the subsequent issuance of official commissions; and making related repeals.
Title
Adding provisions for required fiscal security through bonding, blanket bonding and insuring of elected and appointed county officers and employees; providing for determining the form, amount and payment of premiums for and the filing and recording of the required security and for the subsequent issuance of official commissions; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Creighton [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. Mauree Gingrich [R] | Rep. William Kortz [D] |
Rep. Michael Peifer [R] | Rep. Chris Ross [R] | Rep. RoseMarie Swanger [R] | Sen. Steven Santarsiero [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-10-03 - House - HB 1438 PN 2085, FP (Y: 198 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-11 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-10-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-10-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-1) |
2011-10-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-09-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-09-28 | House | Second consideration |
2011-09-27 | House | Removed from table |
2011-09-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-09-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-06-14 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2011-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2011-06-14 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-05-03 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |