PA HB1429 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-10)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Act No. 95
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-10)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Act No. 95
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in powers of attorney, further providing for general provisions and for special rules for gifts; providing for agent's duties and for principles of law and equity; further providing for form of power of attorney, for implementation of power of attorney and for liability; providing for liability for refusal to accept power of attorney and for activities through employees; and further providing for validity.
Title
In powers of attorney, further providing for general provisions and for special rules for gifts; providing for agent's duties and for principles of law and equity; further providing for form of power of attorney, for implementation of power of attorney and for liability; providing for liability for refusal to accept power of attorney and for activities through employees; and further providing for validity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - HB 1429 PN 2006, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - HB 1429 PN 2006, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | House | Act No. 95 |
2014-07-02 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-06-24 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-23 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-18 | House | Signed in House |
2014-06-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (193-0) |
2014-06-18 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-06-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-06-16 | House | In the House |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-06-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2013-06-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-18 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-11 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-06-03 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |