PA HB1406 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, repealing provisions relating to contribution for Korea/Vietnam Memorial National Education Center and further providing for operational provisions.
Title
In personal income tax, repealing provisions relating to contribution for Korea/Vietnam Memorial National Education Center and further providing for operational provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-12 | House | Removed from table |
2018-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-05-22 | House | Removed from table |
2018-05-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-01-24 | House | Removed from table |
2018-01-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-10-25 | House | Removed from table |
2017-10-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-09-11 | House | Removed from table |
2017-06-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-28 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-23 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to FINANCE |