PA HB140 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-05 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rules of the road in general, further providing for additional parking regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In rules of the road in general, further providing for additional parking regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00291 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-02-04HouseLaid on the table
2021-02-04HouseFirst consideration
2021-02-04HouseReported as amended
2021-01-13HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=140
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0140&pn=0106
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0140&pn=0387
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2021&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=0140&pn=0106&aYear=2021&an=00291
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=02/04/2021&RollCallId=71
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=02/04/2021&RollCallId=72

Bill Comments

feedback