PA HB139 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the administration of permits by State agencies, for a tracking system for permit applications, for the establishment of permit programs and for annual reports.
Title
Providing for the administration of permits by State agencies, for a tracking system for permit applications, for the establishment of permit programs and for annual reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 139 PN 104, FP (Y: 113 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Floor: HB 139 PN 104, FP (Y: 113 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS |
2021-05-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-05-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (113-88) |
2021-05-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-05-03 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-03 | House | Second consideration |
2021-04-21 | House | Removed from table |
2021-04-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-04-20 | House | First consideration |
2021-04-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |