PA HB1387 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, in Uninsured Employers Guaranty Fund, further providing for claim petition.
Title
In Uninsured Employers Guaranty Fund, further providing for claim petition.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Nelson [R] | Rep. Tina Pickett [R] | Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R] | Rep. Eric Davanzo [R] |
Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] | Rep. Brett Miller [R] | Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] |
Rep. Jason Silvis [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1387 PN 1791, FP (Y: 113 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1387 PN 1657, 2021 A1519, MULLERY (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1387 PN 1657, 2021 A1438, E. NELSON (Y: 112 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01067 (Y: 10 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1387 PN 1791, FP (Y: 113 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1387 PN 1657, 2021 A1519, MULLERY (Y: 90 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1387 PN 1657, 2021 A1438, E. NELSON (Y: 112 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A01067 (Y: 10 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2021-06-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (113-89) |
2021-06-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-14 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-06-08 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-02 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1657 |
2021-06-02 | House | Committee erroneously reported as amended, May 26, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-26 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-05-14 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |