PA HB1384 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5)
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-08 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-08 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for powers and duties of the Juvenile Court Judges' Commission.
Title
Further providing for powers and duties of the Juvenile Court Judges' Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-09-14 - House - HB 1384 PN 1697, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-08 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2010-09-14 | In the Senate | |
2010-09-14 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-09-13 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-13 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-05-06 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-05-06 | Removed from table | |
2009-05-05 | Laid on the table | |
2009-05-05 | First consideration | |
2009-05-05 | Reported as committed | |
2009-04-29 | Referred to JUDICIARY |